Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/09/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/09/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/09/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/09/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/09/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/09/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/09/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/09/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/09/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/09/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/09/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/10/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/10/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/10/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/10/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/10/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/10/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/10/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/11/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/12/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/12/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/12/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/12/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/12/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/12/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/23/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/23/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/23/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/23/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/23/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/23/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/23/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/23/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/23/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/23/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 02/23/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/25/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/25/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/25/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/25/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/25/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/25/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/25/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/25/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/25/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/25/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/25/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/25/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/25/1998