Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/10/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/10/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/28/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/28/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/28/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/28/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/28/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/28/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/28/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/28/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/28/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/28/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/28/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/30/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/30/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/02/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/02/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/02/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/02/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/02/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/30/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/30/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/30/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/30/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/30/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/25/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/28/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/28/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/28/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/28/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/28/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/28/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/28/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/29/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/29/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/29/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/29/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/30/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/30/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/30/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/30/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/30/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/30/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/01/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/06/1998