Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/25/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/25/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/25/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/25/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/05/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/17/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/17/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/19/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/20/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/20/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/20/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/20/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/21/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/07/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/18/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/18/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/18/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/02/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/02/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/11/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/19/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/23/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/24/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/24/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/24/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/13/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/13/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/15/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/21/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/22/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/24/1998