Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/01/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/01/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/02/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/02/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/02/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/02/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/05/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/05/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/05/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/05/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/06/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/07/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/07/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/07/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/07/1998