Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/18/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/23/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/23/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/23/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/23/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/23/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/23/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/26/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/26/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/01/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/01/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/01/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/01/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/06/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/06/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/08/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/09/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/21/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/12/1997