Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 01/09/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/09/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/09/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 01/09/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/04/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/04/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/04/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/04/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/05/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/05/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/05/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/05/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/10/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/12/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/12/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/12/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/25/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/25/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/11/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew