Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/09/1997