Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/18/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 09/18/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/23/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/23/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/23/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/24/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/28/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/28/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/01/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/01/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/05/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/05/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/06/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/06/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/06/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/07/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/07/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/08/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/08/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/08/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/08/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/08/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/08/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/08/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/09/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/09/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/10/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/13/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/13/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/19/1998