Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 08/06/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/11/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/09/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/14/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/14/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/14/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/15/1998