Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/04/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 08/04/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/04/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/10/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/10/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/14/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/14/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/14/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/15/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/15/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/15/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/16/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/16/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/16/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/16/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/16/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/16/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/16/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/16/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/16/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/16/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/16/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/16/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/16/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/16/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/16/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/16/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/16/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/16/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/16/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/16/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/18/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/23/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/24/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/24/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/28/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/28/1998