Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/05/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/24/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/17/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/23/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/31/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/14/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/22/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/31/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/31/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/15/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/17/1998