Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/06/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/29/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/11/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/18/1997