Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/18/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/18/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/20/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/20/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/09/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/15/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/17/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/17/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/01/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/13/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/13/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/13/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/15/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/15/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/05/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/05/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 06/20/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/26/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/09/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/09/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/16/1997