Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/19/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/19/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/19/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 08/07/1998