Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/15/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/15/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/25/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/10/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/16/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/25/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/12/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/12/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/19/1998