Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/05/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/27/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/27/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/20/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/20/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/11/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/11/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/11/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/11/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/05/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/24/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/24/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 10/07/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/21/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/21/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/21/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/28/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/04/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/04/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/26/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/30/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/30/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/23/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/19/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/19/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/23/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/06/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/1998