Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/06/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/08/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/09/1998