Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/29/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/29/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/29/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/29/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/30/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/30/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/04/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/09/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/09/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/09/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/09/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/09/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/09/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/14/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/14/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/23/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/23/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/12/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/13/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/15/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/15/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/15/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/15/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/15/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/15/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/15/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/15/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/20/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/20/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/20/1998