Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 07/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/27/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/29/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/29/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/30/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/30/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/31/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/31/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 08/05/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 08/07/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/10/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/10/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/10/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/10/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/11/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/11/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/11/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/14/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/14/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/15/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/17/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/17/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/01/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/1998