Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/16/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/16/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/16/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/23/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/23/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/09/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/09/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/11/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/16/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/25/1998