Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/14/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/14/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/14/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/14/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/20/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/20/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/20/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/20/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/20/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/20/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/24/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/24/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/29/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/29/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/29/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/06/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/09/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/25/1998