Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/24/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/24/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/24/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/24/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/14/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/15/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/22/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/05/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/10/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/23/1998