Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/16/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/1998