Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/17/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/14/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/14/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/14/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/23/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/23/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/23/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/23/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/23/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/28/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/28/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/28/1998