Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/27/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/03/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/07/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/10/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/10/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/02/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/02/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/02/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/02/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/02/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/09/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/09/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/09/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/09/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/09/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/09/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/13/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/15/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/15/1998