Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/05/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/16/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/16/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/16/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/14/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/14/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/20/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/29/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/29/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/29/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/05/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/07/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/07/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/09/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew