Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/14/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/14/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/17/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/17/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/17/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/17/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/17/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/17/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/17/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/17/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/17/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/17/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/19/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/19/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/19/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/19/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/19/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/21/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/29/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 08/04/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 08/04/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 08/04/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/04/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/04/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/04/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/23/1998