Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/14/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/20/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/30/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/07/1998