Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/07/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/07/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/20/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/20/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/20/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/23/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/23/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/14/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/20/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/20/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/20/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/20/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/30/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/30/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/06/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/07/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/07/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/07/1998