Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/01/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/01/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/28/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/28/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/07/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/04/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/07/1998