Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/23/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/23/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/24/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/25/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/27/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/21/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/28/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/07/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/12/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/12/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/12/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/13/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/19/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/22/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/22/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/1998