Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/01/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/09/1998