Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/19/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/19/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/1998