Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/11/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/11/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/11/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/17/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/22/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/22/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/12/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/13/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/14/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/21/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/21/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/21/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/22/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/25/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/08/1998