Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/04/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/10/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1998
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/12/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/24/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/27/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/30/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/30/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/28/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/29/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/30/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/13/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/1998