Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/03/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/04/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/10/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/10/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/11/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/17/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/26/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/26/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/21/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/04/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/04/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/1998