Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/24/1998