Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/25/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/04/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/04/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/04/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/04/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/05/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/10/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/10/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/10/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/16/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/16/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/17/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/23/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/15/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/23/1998