Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/27/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/27/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/28/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/28/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 01/28/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/04/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/04/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/11/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/11/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/11/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/11/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/11/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/25/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/25/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/04/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/04/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/04/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/10/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/07/1998