Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/24/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/24/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/03/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/10/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/27/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/30/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/05/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/14/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/21/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/06/1998