Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 11/07/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 11/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/05/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/24/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/03/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/04/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/04/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/12/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/18/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/18/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/18/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/18/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/18/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/24/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/24/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/26/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/01/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/21/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/21/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/30/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/19/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/20/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/04/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/04/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/09/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/10/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/10/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/23/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/14/1998