Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 11/05/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/10/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/12/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/20/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/29/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/29/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/29/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/03/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/03/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/06/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/09/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/22/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/1998