Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/29/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/29/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/29/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/04/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/09/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/09/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/13/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/03/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/03/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/03/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/04/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/04/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/17/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/25/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/05/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/23/1998