Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 09/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/26/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/30/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/01/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/28/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/02/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/12/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/25/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/26/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/31/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/05/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/20/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/29/1998