Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/30/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 10/09/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/21/1997