Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/15/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/15/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/15/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/15/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/15/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/15/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/15/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/15/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/15/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/15/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/26/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/07/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/07/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/07/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/22/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/23/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/25/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/25/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/12/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/06/1998