Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/05/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/05/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/05/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/08/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/08/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/08/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/08/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/08/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/08/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 11/08/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/08/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/08/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/08/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/08/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/08/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/08/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/08/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/08/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/08/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/08/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/08/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/12/1997
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/04/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/23/1998