Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/25/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/25/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/28/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/29/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/29/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/30/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/07/1998