Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/17/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/29/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/03/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/20/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew