Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/18/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/19/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/19/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/20/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/20/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/20/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/20/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/24/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/24/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/24/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/24/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/24/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/24/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/26/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/10/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/16/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/17/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/1997